EP0737770 - Looper thread control method and device for a double chainstitch sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEGASUS SEWING MACHINE MFG. CO., LTD. 7-2, Sagisu 5-Chome Fukushima-Ku Osaka 553 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states PEGASUS SEWING MACHINE MFG. CO., LTD. 7-2, Sagisu 5-Chome Fukushima-Ku Osaka 553 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Minoru c/o Pegasus Sewing Mach.MFG. CO.Ltd 7-2 Sagisu 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka 553 / JP | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey, et al F.J. Cleveland & Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302521.8 | 10.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | JP19950112501 | 12.04.1995 Original published format: JP 11250195 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737770 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737770 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D05B1/10, D05B57/02, D05B61/00, D05B63/00 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
D05B1/10 (EP,US);
D05B69/00 (KR);
D05B61/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/42] | D05B63/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überwachen des Greiferfadens einer Doppelkettenstichnähmaschine | [1996/42] | English: | Looper thread control method and device for a double chainstitch sewing machine | [1996/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle du fil du boucleur pour une machine à coudre à points de chaînette double | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 13.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/42] | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3722438 (SCHINZEL F, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column W *; | [A]US2975737 (LUKINS RICHARD H) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3065717 (REIMER GEORGE M) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [DA]US4480562 (VON HAGEN WOLF R [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [A]US1443084 (MOFFATT JAMES R, et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 3,7-13 *; | [A]US1702792 (MOFFATT JAMES R); | [A]US2046928 (RIVIERE ALBERT S, et al) |