EP0737459 - Ostomy coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000 Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [1996/42] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08540-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steer, Graham Emery 39 Rowallen Road Fulham, London SW6 6AF / GB | 02 /
Plass, Ronald 3 Croxton Lane Lindfield, West Sussex RH16 2SN / GB | 03 /
Barratt, Howard West Wing, Pleystowe House, Rusper Road Capel, Dorking, Surrey RH5 5HE / GB | 04 /
Steer, Peter Leslie "Woodlands Rise", Kingscote East Grinstead, Sussex RH10 4JZ / GB | 05 /
Hollands, Keith G.M. 7 Cokeham Lane Sompting, Sussex / GB | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2000/37] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novapat International S.A. 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1998/23] | Holmes, Miles Keeton D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1996/42] | Cook, Anthony John D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302560.6 | 11.04.1996 | [1996/42] | Priority number, date | GB19950007666 | 13.04.1995 Original published format: GB 9507666 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0737459 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0737459 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737459 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/448 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
A61F5/448 (EP,US);
C07C43/11 (EP,US);
C11D1/825 (EP,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,US);
A61F2005/4486 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | Ostomiekupplung | [1996/42] | English: | Ostomy coupling | [1996/42] | French: | Accouplement d'ostomie | [1996/42] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.06.2004 | CH | 23.06.2004 | LI | 23.06.2004 | [2005/14] |
Former [2004/51] | CH | 23.06.2004 | |
LI | 23.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9101119 (COLOPLAST AS [DK]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0461007 (BIOTROL SA LAB [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 13, line 9 - line 53 *; | [A]US5180377 (HOLTERMANN HENRI [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2261376 (SIMPLA PLASTICS [GB]) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [XP]GB2289221 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [XP] 1-5 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 23; figure - * |