Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6125198 | 26.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9720495 | 21.04.1995 | US62970896 | 09.04.1996 | US19632998 | 19.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3539788B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2004 | B2 | JPH08294143 | 05.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9720495 | 21.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0738872 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2002 | B1 | EP0738872 | 14.07.1999 | A3 | EP0738872 | 23.10.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP9720495 | 21.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2174590 | 08.02.2000 | C | CA2174590 | 22.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9720495 | 21.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69624614T | 03.07.2003 | T2 | DE69624614D1 | 12.12.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9720495 | 21.04.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5867591 | 02.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9720495 | 21.04.1995 |