EP0738534 - Filter assembly and method of making a filter assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PALL CORPORATION 2200 Northern Blvd. East Hills, New York 11548 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states Pall Corporation 2200 Northern Blvd. East Hills, New York 11548 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitlock, Michael B. 526 Hoy Road Cortland, NY 13045 / US | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Knott, Stephen Gilbert, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302649.7 | 16.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | US19950426076 | 21.04.1995 Original published format: US 426076 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0738534 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0738534 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/10, B01D46/00, B01D46/24, B01D29/11 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
B01D46/0001 (EP,KR,US);
B01D29/111 (EP,KR,US);
B01D63/061 (EP,US);
B01D65/003 (EP,US);
B29C70/84 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2271/025 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2031/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/43] | B01D46/10, B01D46/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | Filtereinheit und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/43] | English: | Filter assembly and method of making a filter assembly | [1996/43] | French: | Ensemble filtrant et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1996/43] | Examination procedure | 28.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 15.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2152399 (HR TEXTRON INC) [X] 24 * page 2, line 87 - page 3, line 25; figures 4-7 * [A] 1,3,4,13,16,18; | [A]US3501013 (MADSEN PER); | [A]FR2255933 (SOFEP [FR]) |