blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0738754

EP0738754 - Rubber compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.1999
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.1999 [1999/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/48]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hojo, Masahiro
4-5-401, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome
Kodaira City, Tokyo / JP
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/43]Whalley, Kevin, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date96302666.117.04.1996
[1996/43]
Priority number, dateJP1995009072417.04.1995         Original published format: JP 9072495
[1996/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738754
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738754
Date:25.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:C08L21/00, C08K5/25, // (C08L21/00, 23:28)
[1996/43]
CPC:
C08K5/25 (EP,US); C08L21/00 (EP,US); Y02T10/86 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08K5/25, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/43]
TitleGerman:Kautschukmischung[1996/43]
English:Rubber compositions[1996/43]
French:Composition de caoutchouc[1996/43]
Examination procedure20.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
27.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.05.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1998Fee for grant paid
23.07.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.08.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5063268  (YOUNG DONALD G [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 62 - line 67; claims 1,8,9 *;
 [A]JPH0598074
 [A]  - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, 7, Derwent World Patents Index, (19930721), vol. 93, no. 20, Database accession no. 164620, XP002008415 & JPH0598074 A 19930420 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.