EP0741152 - Aqueous polyurethane dispersions based on polyether polyols of low monol content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seneker, Stephen D. H.C. 83, Box 99C Sissonsville, West Virginia 25320 / US | 02 /
Barksby, Nigel 100 Dogwood lane Dunbar, West Virginia 25064 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1996/45] | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303102.6 | 02.05.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | US19950437341 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: US 437341 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741152 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741152 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/10, C08G18/32, C08G18/48, C09D175/08 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
C09D175/08 (EP,KR);
C08G18/12 (EP,KR);
C08G18/0823 (EP,KR);
C08G18/3225 (KR);
C08G18/4825 (EP,KR);
C08G18/4866 (EP,KR);
C08G18/6692 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | Wässrige Polyurethandispersionen basierend auf Polyetherpolyole mit niedrigem Monolgehalt | [1996/45] | English: | Aqueous polyurethane dispersions based on polyether polyols of low monol content | [1996/45] | French: | Dispersions aqueuses de polyuréthane basées à polyétherpolyol ayant une teneur en monol réduite | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.1999 | GR | 14.04.1999 | DK | 14.07.1999 | [2003/46] |
Former [2001/23] | AT | 14.04.1999 | |
GR | 14.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 14.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0242731 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * page 4, line 3 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 21 - page 5, line 32 ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP0425694 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 25 - page 3, line 34 * * page 4, line 43 - page 4, line 44 * * example 5 *; | [A]WO9319110 (OLIN CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 9 * * claims 1,13 *; | [A]EP0573206 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 50 - page 2, line 54 * * page 4, line 12 - page 4, line 16 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0581159 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * page 3, line 23 - page 3, line 29 * * page 4, line 37 - page 4, line 44 * * example 1 * |