Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
09.01.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] |
19.09.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
19.09.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
23.05.2003 | Renewal fee | |
01.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
21.02.2003 | Change - classification | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
21.02.2003 | Change - classification | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
28.05.2002 | Renewal fee | |
11.03.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
26.10.2001 | First examination report | |
25.10.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
22.05.2001 | Renewal fee | |
23.05.2000 | Renewal fee | |
22.05.1999 | Renewal fee | |
20.05.1998 | Renewal fee | |
10.10.1997 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] |
07.03.1997 | Publication of search report | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
27.09.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] |