Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07171163 | Global Dossier | 11.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3954197B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2007 | B2 | JPH1119093 | 26.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US83512797 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3857354B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B2 | JPH08317934 | 03.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3857347B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B2 | JPH08317936 | 03.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US37401295 | 18.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3857345B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B2 | JPH08229050 | 10.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3857337B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B2 | JPH08196543 | 06.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3803131B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2006 | B2 | JPH08238255 | 17.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3399651B | Global Dossier | 21.04.2003 | B2 | JPH07171159 | 11.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005021703 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1254637 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2007 | B1 | EP1254637 | 06.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP95309352 | 21.12.1995 | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1157666 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2005 | B1 | EP1157666 | 28.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | EP95309351 | 21.12.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1151725 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | EP95306723 | 22.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0875209 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2006 | B1 | EP0875209 | 04.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83512797 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0737446 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2002 | B1 | EP0737446 | 16.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0722696 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2002 | B1 | EP0722696 | 24.07.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37401295 | 18.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0717967 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2003 | B1 | EP0717967 | 14.08.1996 | A3 | EP0717967 | 26.06.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0717960 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2003 | B1 | EP0717960 | 14.08.1996 | A3 | EP0717960 | 26.06.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0703461 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | B1 | EP0703461 | 12.11.1997 | A3 | EP0703461 | 27.03.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0640317 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1999 | B1 | EP0640317 | 01.03.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0640315 | Global Dossier | 30.12.1998 | B1 | EP0640315 | 01.03.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU687405B | Global Dossier | 26.02.1998 | B2 | AU6862294 | 02.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU679999B | Global Dossier | 17.07.1997 | B2 | AU6862394 | 02.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU726292B | Global Dossier | 02.11.2000 | B2 | AU5971198 | 08.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US83512797 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU694333B | Global Dossier | 16.07.1998 | B2 | AU5061296 | 24.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU716652B | Global Dossier | 02.03.2000 | B2 | AU4200996 | 25.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US37401295 | 18.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU693959B | Global Dossier | 09.07.1998 | B2 | AU4057195 | 27.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU701320B | Global Dossier | 28.01.1999 | B2 | AU4026495 | 27.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3179795 | Global Dossier | 04.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE175090T | 15.01.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE184467T | 15.10.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE239920T | 15.05.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2128136 | 26.10.1999 | C | CA2128136 | 23.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2128450 | 28.05.1996 | C | CA2128450 | 23.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2158783 | 12.12.2006 | C | CA2158783 | 24.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2165714 | 24.10.2006 | C | CA2165714 | 23.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2165715 | 21.11.2006 | C | CA2165715 | 23.06.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2167344 | 09.01.2007 | C | CA2167344 | 19.07.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37401295 | 18.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2173827 | 13.03.2007 | C | CA2173827 | 13.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2233820 | 16.01.2007 | C | CA2233820 | 04.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83512797 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69415613T | 22.07.1999 | T2 | DE69415613D1 | 11.02.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69420650T | 25.05.2000 | T2 | DE69420650D1 | 21.10.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69529730T | 18.12.2003 | T2 | DE69529730D1 | 03.04.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69530646T | 25.03.2004 | T2 | DE69530646D1 | 12.06.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69530747T | 25.03.2004 | T2 | DE69530747D1 | 18.06.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534437T | 22.06.2006 | T2 | DE69534437D1 | 13.10.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69535558T | 17.04.2008 | T2 | DE69535558D1 | 20.09.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69625098T | 20.11.2003 | T2 | DE69625098D1 | 16.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US37401295 | 18.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69625267T | 06.11.2003 | T2 | DE69625267D1 | 23.01.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69834596T | 26.04.2007 | T2 | DE69834596D1 | 29.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US83512797 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2124848T | 16.02.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2136168T | 16.11.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2188721T | 01.07.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2198433T | 01.02.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR940100335 | 22.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR940100336 | 22.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5403312 | 04.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5558671 | 24.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5688270 | 18.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US37401295 | 18.01.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5693051 | 02.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5709680 | 20.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US36206594 | 22.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5735848 | 07.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9615493 | 22.07.1993 | US42570595 | 20.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5807393 | 15.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | US36207092 | 22.12.1992 | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5810811 | 22.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US38593195 | 03.02.1995 | US83512797 | 04.04.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5817093 | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | US74332196 | 04.11.1996 | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5833690 | 10.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US82584297 | 04.04.1997 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US38593195 | 03.02.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5876401 | 02.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US84319597 | 14.04.1997 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US42135395 | 12.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6024741 | 15.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US31129794 | 23.09.1994 | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | US36207094 | 22.12.1994 | US9579793 | 22.07.1993 | US81089697 | 05.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3857357B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B2 | JPH08336544 | 24.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU722398B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2000 | B2 | AU5213596 | 21.11.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0741996 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2004 | B1 | EP0741996 | 23.04.1997 | A3 | EP0741996 | 13.11.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2175870 | 02.01.2007 | C | CA2175870 | 09.11.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69631613T | 16.12.2004 | T2 | DE69631613D1 | 01.04.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2216038T | 16.10.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US43726295 | 08.05.1995 |