EP0742191 - BF3 removal from olefin oligomerisation product stream and recycling of the recovered BF3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive P.O. Box 87703 Chicago Illinois 60680-0703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive P.O. Box 87703 Chicago Illinois 60680-0703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Presedo, Hector 4910 Parkhollow Drive Baton Rouge, Louisiana 70816 / US | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303173.7 | 07.05.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | US19950436696 | 08.05.1995 Original published format: US 436696 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0742191 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0742191 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | [1997/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742191 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07C7/11, C07C2/22, B01J27/32 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
B01J27/32 (EP,US);
C07C2/20 (EP,US);
C07C2527/1213 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/46] | Title | German: | BF3-Rückgewinnung aus Olefinoligomerisierungsprodukten und Rückführung des rückgewonnenen BF3 | [1999/28] | English: | BF3 removal from olefin oligomerisation product stream and recycling of the recovered BF3 | [1996/46] | French: | Récupération de BF3 à partir d'un produit de l'oligomérisation d'oléfines et recyclage du BF3 récupéré | [1996/46] |
Former [1996/46] | BF3-Rückgewinnung aus Olefinoligomerisierungsprodukte und Rückführung des rückgewonnenen BF3 | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 19.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4238417 (AUSTIN RICHARD G [US], et al) [A] 1-7; | [A]US4282013 (FRANKLIN FREDERICK C, et al)[A] 8; | [X]EP0364889 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 41 - line 54; example 3; claim 1 *; | [AX]EP0493024 (NESTE OY [FI]) [A] 1-7 * column W * [X] 8; | [X]EP0594065 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 43; claim 1 * |