EP0745326 - Stabilization of aqueous 3-isothiazolone solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattox, John Robert 637 Cedar Lane Perkasie, Pennsylvania 18944 / US | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [1999/22] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | ||
Former [1996/49] | Angell, David Whilton, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303342.8 | 13.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | US19950450190 | 25.05.1995 Original published format: US 450190 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745326 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745326 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, A01N25/22 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/80, A01N51/00, A01N25/22 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | Stabilisierung von wässrigen 3-Isothiazolonlösungen | [1996/49] | English: | Stabilization of aqueous 3-isothiazolone solutions | [1996/49] | French: | Stabilisation de solutions aqueuses de 3-isothiazolones | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 20.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.1999 | SE | 22.09.1999 | PT | 22.12.1999 | IE | 13.05.2000 | LU | 13.05.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
SE | 22.09.1999 | ||
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
IE | 13.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
IE | 13.05.2000 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 22.09.1999 | |
PT | 22.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 22.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0411750 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-8* page 3, line 10 - line 11 * |