EP0747655 - Blended missile autopilot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY PO Box 902 2000 East El Segundo Blvd. El Segundo California 90245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Raytheon Company PO Box 902, 2000 El Segundo Blvd. El Segundo, California 90245 / US | ||
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states HUGHES MISSILE SYSTEMS COMPANY 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, California 90080-0028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cannon, James J. 1800 Key West Avenue Northridge, CA 91326 / US | 02 /
Elkanick, Mark E. 7671 E. Tanque Verde No.223 Tucson, Arizona 85715 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1996/50] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303437.6 | 15.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950463603 | 05.06.1995 Original published format: US 463603 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747655 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747655 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F41G7/00, G05D1/10, F41G7/20 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
F42B10/64 (EP,US);
F41G7/22 (EP,US);
F42B10/663 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/50] | F41G7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | Vielseitiger Autopilot für Raketen | [1996/50] | English: | Blended missile autopilot | [1996/50] | French: | Pilote automatique de type multiple pour missile | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 26.01.2002 | Observations by third parties | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2004 | Observations by third parties | 04.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 11.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0695737 ; | [Y]DE3047389 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 5 * page 5, line 8 - page 10, line 14; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5094406 (SHAFER DANIEL E [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * column A * * column 3, line 12 - column 8, line 2; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]EP0489712 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 2, column 2, line 36 - page 4, column 6, line 58; figures 1-9 * [Y] 5; | [A]US5259569 (WAYMEYER WALTER K [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * column A * * column 4, line 27 - column 8, line 9; figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO9400731 (GRUSHIN PETR D [RU], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0695737 (JAPAN TECH RES & DEV INST, et al) [A] 1,3,5 * figures 1-5 *; | [AP]EP0683086 (TRW INC [US]) [AP] 1,3,5 * abstract ** page 4, line 6 - page 10, line 34; figures 1-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940708), vol. 018, no. 365, Database accession no. (P - 1767), & JP06095737 A 19940408 (TECH RES & DEV INST OF JAPAN DEF AGENCY;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * | other | JPS63290400K | JPS63290400 | JPH04316994 | JPH07133999 | - INNOCENTI M., THUKRAL A., "Simultaneous Reaction Jet and Aerdoynamic Control of Missile Systems", AIAA, (1993), pages 347 - 354, XP002907507 | - WEIL R.D ET AL, "Blended Aero & Reaction Jet Missile Autopilot Design Using VSS Techniques", IEEE, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 30TH CONFERENCE ON DECISION AND CONTROL, BRIGHTON UK, (1991), pages 2028 - 2029, XP002907508 |