EP0747812 - Customer information control system and method with API start and cancel transaction functions in a loosely coupled parallel processing environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 10435 N. Tantau Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014-3548 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hotea, Andreas E. 900 Pepper Tree Lane, Apt. 725 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 02 /
De Roo, John S. 900 Pepper Tree Lane, Apt. 725 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 03 /
Phillips, Mark 4136 Lemoyne Way Campbell, California 95008 / US | 04 /
Velasco, David 1370 Hacienda Court Campbell, California 95008 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303648.8 | 22.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950479702 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 479702 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747812 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747812 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
G06F9/466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | CICS-System und Verfahren mit API Funktionen zum Starten und Annullieren von Transaktionen in einer lose gekoppelten Parallelverarbeitungsumgebung | [1996/50] | English: | Customer information control system and method with API start and cancel transaction functions in a loosely coupled parallel processing environment | [1996/50] | French: | Système et méthode CICS avec des fonctions API pour démarrer et annuler des transactions dans un environnement de traitement parallèle à couplage lâche | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/25] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9420903 (NAUCKHOFF SVEN [SE]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * page 4, line 19 - line 21 * * page 7, line 1 - line 34 * * page 11, line 4 - line 14 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 14 * * page 26, line 1 - line 3 * [Y] 4,6; | [Y]GB2274345 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,6 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 3 * * page 4, line 8 - line 26 * * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 4 * |