EP0744655 - Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/48] | Novel cyan coupler for silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material | ||
[1999/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikesu, Satoru c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Rudchenko, Vladimir F. c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Mitsuhiro c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kaneko, Yutaka c/o Konica Corp., 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303681.9 | 23.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | JP19950123794 | 23.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12379495 | JP19950144504 | 12.06.1995 Original published format: JP 14450495 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744655 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744655 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/38, // C07D487/04 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G03C7/3835 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/48] | G03C7/38, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/48] | Title | German: | Farbphotographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1999/24] | English: | Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material | [1999/24] | French: | Produit photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent | [1999/24] |
Former [1996/48] | Neue Cyankuppler für farbphotographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial | ||
Former [1996/48] | Novel cyan coupler for silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material | ||
Former [1996/48] | Nouveau coupleur formateur de cyan pour produit photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent | Examination procedure | 29.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0287265 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [DX] 1,3,4 * page 11; examples I-16 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0608133 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] * page 11; examples II-23 * * claim 1 * |