EP0744440 - Ethylene/alpha-olefin/nonconjugated polyene terpolymer rubber composition and vulcanized rubber obtained therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakahama, Hidenari c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind., Ltd, 3, Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 02 /
Kawasaki, Masaaki c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind., Ltd, 3, Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 03 /
Tojo, Tetsuo c/o Mitsui Petrochem. Ind., Ltd, 3, Chigusa-Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-01 / JP | 04 /
Tsutsui, Toshiyuki 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 05 /
Sagane, Toshihiro c/o Mitsui Petro. Ind., Ltd. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303718.9 | 24.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | JP19950125433 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12543395 | JP19950125434 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12543495 | JP19950125436 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12543695 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744440 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744440 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08L9/02 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
C08L9/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08L9/00 (KR);
C08L23/083 (EP,US);
C08L2312/00 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/16, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L9/02, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/48] | Title | German: | Ethylen/alpha-Olefin/nichtkonjugiertes Polyencopolymerkautschuk und daraus vulkanisierter Kautschuk | [1996/48] | English: | Ethylene/alpha-olefin/nonconjugated polyene terpolymer rubber composition and vulcanized rubber obtained therefrom | [1996/48] | French: | Caoutchouc à base d'éthylène/alpha-oléfine/polyène non conjugé et caoutchouc vulcanisé ainsi obtenu | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0753802 ; | [A]JPH06179722 ; | [A]JPS5698249 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 17, Database accession no. 95-128510, XP002012700 & JPH0753802 A 19950228 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 30, Database accession no. 94-245711, XP002012701 & JPH06179722 A 19940628 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 81, no. 38, Database accession no. 81-69022D, XP002012702 & JPS5698249 A 19810807 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND KK) [A] 5,6 * abstract * |