Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0758612
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.11.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] |
01.07.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
28.10.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
20.05.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.04.1998 |
First examination report |
|
23.04.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.10.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] |
12.09.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] |
08.08.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
03.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] |