Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
04.04.2001 | Renewal fee | |
08.09.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
31.05.2000 | Renewal fee | |
21.01.2000 | Publication of search report | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] |
26.05.1999 | Renewal fee | |
29.05.1998 | Renewal fee | |
25.10.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |