EP0748077 - Asymmetric ping-pong communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodeep, George E. 1629 Creek Mill Trace Lawrenceville, Georgia 30244 / US | 02 /
Woodward, Sheryl Leigh 84 Leedsville Drive Lincoft, New Jersey 07738 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303821.1 | 29.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950473848 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 473848 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0748077 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0748077 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H04L5/1476 (EP,US);
H04L5/1423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1996/50] | Title | German: | Übertragungssystem mit asymmetrischem Pingpong-Verfahren | [1996/50] | English: | Asymmetric ping-pong communication system | [1996/50] | French: | Système de communication à "ping-pong" asymétrique | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 15.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5255111 (KWA PETER T H [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-15,17-26 * column 2, line 15 - line 18 * * column 2, line 61 - line 68 * * column 3, line 1 - line 3 * * column 4, line 26 - line 28 * * figure 2 * * figures 3A-D *; | [A]GB1388397 (CATTERMOLE K W, et al) [A] 1,2,4-8,18-20 * page 1, line 61 - line 66 * * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 5 *; | [A]US4638473 (COOPERMAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 3,16 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - line 15 * * column 5, line 66 - line 68 *; | [A]US4202000 (CARBALLES JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 11-14 * column 1, line 21 - line 23 * * column 4, line 3 - line 16 * * figures 2,5 *; | [PX] - WOODWARD S L ET AL, "A FULL-DUPLEX OPTICAL DATA LINK USING LASERS AS TRANSCEIVERS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, New York, US, (19950901), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 1041 - 1043, XP000527518 [PX] 1-26 * page 1, column 2, line 34 - line 44 * * page 2, column 1, line 14 - line 16 * * page 2, column 2, line 8 - line 13 * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.414703 |