Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0748084
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.01.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
07.10.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.09.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.04.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2003 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
14.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.06.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] |
04.04.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] |
08.11.1996 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] |
25.10.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |