Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3860858B | Global Dossier | 20.12.2006 | B2 | JPH09133757 | 20.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US48727295 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0748084 | Global Dossier | 11.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48727295 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2176882 | 02.11.2004 | C | CA2176882 | 08.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48727295 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL118286 | 26.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US48727295 | 07.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5588005 | 24.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US48727295 | 07.06.1995 |