EP0748084 - Method for primary and mutter mode communication for asset tracking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/50] | Protocol and mechanism for primary and mutter mode communication for asset tracking | ||
[2003/09] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ali, Irfan (NMN) 1187 Hillside Avenue, Apt. 4A4 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Hladik, Stephen Michael 13 Olympus Court Albany, New York 12208 / US | 03 /
Hershey, John Erik 4 Vines Road Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | 04 /
Hassan, Amer Aref 412 Key West Mews Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 05 /
Chennakeshu, Sandeep (NMN) 204-H Hyde Park Court Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 06 /
Welles II, Kenneth Brakeley 104 Hetcheltown Road Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 07 /
Koilpillai, Ravinder David 210 Hyde Park Court, Apt. E Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 08 /
Tomlinson, Harold Woodruff, Jr. 1001 Arapaho Path Scotia, New York 12302 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/21] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1996/50] | Matthews, Graham Farrah, et al London Patent Operation, GE International Inc, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303828.6 | 29.05.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950487272 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 487272 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748084 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, G08G1/127, G01S5/14, B61L25/02 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
B61L25/021 (EP,US);
B61L25/025 (EP,US);
G01S5/0027 (EP,US);
G08G1/127 (EP,US);
H04B7/18545 (EP,US);
H04B7/18576 (EP,US);
H04W84/20 (EP,US);
B61L2205/04 (EP,US);
G01S19/09 (EP,US);
G01S19/14 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren für Primarmodus- und "Mutter"-Moduskommunikation zur Güterortung | [2003/09] | English: | Method for primary and mutter mode communication for asset tracking | [2003/09] | French: | Procédé pour communication en mode primaire et en mode "Mutter" pour localisation de biens | [2003/09] |
Former [1996/50] | Protokoll und Mechanismus für Primarmodus- und "Mutter"-Moduskommunikation für Güterordnung | ||
Former [1996/50] | Protocol and mechanism for primary and mutter mode communication for asset tracking | ||
Former [1996/50] | Protocole et mécanisme pour communication en mode primaire et en mode "Mutter" pour localisation de bécus | Examination procedure | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4682326 (ULUG MEHMET E [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * column A; claim - *; | [A]EP0528522 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0529269 (IBM [US]) [A] 2* claim - *; | [A]GB2263182 (MOTOROLA ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [A] 2-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9415413 (NORAND CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * claim - *; | [A]US5355511 (HATANO RIKUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W * |