Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0747282
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.11.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
24.11.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
01.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.07.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.07.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.02.1999 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.11.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] |
25.10.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |