EP0748056 - An error detection and correction system for a stream of encoded data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES 2355 Main Street Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claydon, Anthony Peter John 14 Sydney Buildings Bath, Avon BA2 6BZ / GB | 02 /
Thomas, Richard James Ground Floor Flat, 2 Dover Place Clifton, Bristol BS8 1AL / GB | 03 /
Gammack, Richard John 22 Gloucester St., St. James Bristol, Avon BS2 8PN / GB | 04 /
Foxcroft, Thomas 52B Pembroke Road Clifton, Bristol BS8 3DT / GB | 05 /
Robbins, William Philip 19 Springhill Cam, Gloucestershire GL11 5PE / GB | 06 /
Kuligowski, Andrew Peter 1st Floor Flat, 87 Alma Rd Clifton, Bristol BS8 2DJ / GB | 07 /
MacFarlane, Charles Dunlop 8 Woodland Avenue Dursley, Gloucestershire GL11 4EW / GB | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schroeter-Fleuchaus- Lehmann & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/50] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schroeter, Fleuchaus, Lehmann & Gallo, Patentanwälte, Postfach 71 03 50 81453 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96304168.6 | 06.06.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950480976 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 480976 | GB19960005190 | 12.03.1996 Original published format: GB 9605190 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0748056 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0748056 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H03M13/00 (KR);
H03M13/23 (EP);
H03M13/41 (EP);
H03M13/4169 (EP);
H03M13/6362 (EP);
H03M13/6502 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP);
H04L1/0054 (EP);
H04L1/0065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | Fehlerdetektion und Korrekturverfahren für kodierten Datenstrom | [1996/50] | English: | An error detection and correction system for a stream of encoded data | [1996/50] | French: | Système de détection de correction d'erreurs pour un flux de données codées | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 21.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/20] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0052463 (PLESSEY OVERSEAS [GB]) [A] 1,3-7 * page 12, line 10 - page 19, line 20; figure 13; claim 11 * * page 9, line 21 - page 9, line 25 *; | [A]US4932029 (HEICHLER JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1,3-7 * column 1, line 6 - column 4, line 32 *; | [A] - ETSI, "European Telecommunication Standard ETS 300 421", ETSI, (199412), pages 1 - 24, XP000671573 [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0004]; figure B.1 * | [A] - L. CHRISTOPHER, J. STEWART, K. RAMASWAMY, P. WAGNER, P. MURPHY, D. ALBEAN, D. MCALLISTER, "A Fully Integrated Digital Demodulation and Forward Error Correction IC for Digital Satellite Television", IEEE 1995 CUSTOM INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, (19950501), pages 281 - 284, XP000536807 [A] 1-7 * page 281 - page 284 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CICC.1995.518186 | [A] - G. FEYGIN AND P.G. GULAK, "Survivor Sequence Memory Management in Viterbi Decoders", 1991 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, SINGAPORE, (19910611), vol. 5, pages 2967 - 2970, XP000299333 [A] 2-4,6 | [A] - G. FEYGIN AND P.G. GULAK, "Architectural Tradeoffs for Survivor Sequence Memory Management in Viterbi Decoders", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, (199303), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 425 - 429, XP000372685 [A] 2-4,6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.221067 | [A] - F.M. GARDNER, "A BPSK/QPSK Timing-Error Detector for Sampled Receivers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (198605), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 423 - 429, XP000608506 [A] 4,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096561 | [A] - L.E. PELLON, "A Double Nyquist Digital Product Detector for Quadrature Sampling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, NEW YORK, (199207), vol. 40, no. 7, pages 1670 - 1680, XP000307658 [A] 4,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.143439 | [A] - J. HAGENAUER, "Rate-Compatible Punctured Convolutional Codes (RCPC Codes) and their Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (198804), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 389 - 400, XP000670428 [A] 1,3-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.2763 |