EP0750438 - Mobile station security [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janhila, Pertti Hämmäistenkatu 2 as 6 24100 Salo / FI | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1996/52] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Nokia Mobile Phones, Patent Department, St. Georges Court, St. Georges Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96304543.0 | 19.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | FI19950003026 | 19.06.1995 Original published format: FI 953026 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750438 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750438 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H04W12/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/52] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung an einem Mobilfunkgerät | [1996/52] | English: | Mobile station security | [1996/52] | French: | Sûreté d'une station mobile | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 30.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.08.2005 | LI | 17.08.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | SE | 17.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0607767 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1-11; | [A]WO9501695 (MOTOROLA INC [US])[A] 1,4,10; | [A]US5392356 (KONNO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11; | [XA]EP0652681 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,10 [A] 7-9,11 |