EP0757074 - Process of stabilising siloxane polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF6 7YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF6 7YL Wales / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cray, Stephen 10 Donniford Close Sully, South Glamorgan, Wales / GB | 02 /
Evans, Martin 59 Osmore Drive Porthcawl, Mid Glamorgan, Wales / GB | 03 /
Perrett, Samantha 146 Rhiw'r Ddar Taff's Well, Mid Glamorgan, Wales / GB | 04 /
Mackinnon, Iain 39 Samson Street Llantwit Major, South Glamorgan, Wales / GB | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Vandamme, Luc Johan Roger Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF6 7YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Vandamme, Luc Johan Roger Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF6 7YL Wales / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305350.9 | 22.07.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | GB19950015616 | 29.07.1995 Original published format: GB 9515616 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0757074 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0757074 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757074 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/05, C08G77/16, C08G77/18 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
C08G77/26 (EP,KR);
C08G77/16 (EP,KR);
C08G77/18 (EP,KR);
C08K5/05 (EP,KR);
C08L83/04 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/05, C08L83/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Stabilisierung von Siloxan-Polymeren | [1997/06] | English: | Process of stabilising siloxane polymers | [1997/06] | French: | Procédé de stabilisation des polymères de siloxane | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07] | Request for further processing for: | 22.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.02.2002 | GB | 22.07.2002 | ES | 29.08.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/21] | GB | 22.07.2002 | |
ES | 29.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 29.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6284174 ; | [X]US2755261 (CLARK HAROLD A) [X] 1-3 * example 2 *; | [X]US3575917 (KAPRAL ALES M) [X] 1-12 * column 1, line 29 - line 31 * * column 3, line 22 - line 58 *; | [A]US4318939 (WONG CHING-PING) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0314316 (DOW CORNING SA [BE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 87-146910, XP002019313 & JPS6284174 A 19870417 (TORAY) [A] 1 * abstract * |