26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
26.10.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
01.06.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] |
18.05.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
09.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] |
02.03.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
17.03.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] |
03.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
26.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.10.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
29.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.08.1998 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.08.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
13.12.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] |
27.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
27.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|