Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3107750B | Global Dossier | 13.11.2000 | B2 | JPH09104182 | 22.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU706029B | Global Dossier | 10.06.1999 | B2 | AU6066396 | 30.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0755781 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2000 | B1 | EP0755781 | 29.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE192384T | 15.05.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2182145 | 05.02.2002 | C | CA2182145 | 28.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69608041T | 21.12.2000 | T2 | DE69608041D1 | 08.06.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5649486 | 22.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US50833095 | 27.07.1995 |