Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0756936
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.08.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
30.08.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
24.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
12.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.2002 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
06.12.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.02.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.12.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.07.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.10.1999 |
First examination report |
|
28.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.02.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |
27.06.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] |
19.12.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] |
24.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
24.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|