EP0756936 - Ink cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Toyonori, c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. 15-1, Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305635.3 | 31.07.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | JP19950216669 | 01.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21666995 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0756936 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0756936 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756936 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
B41J2/1752 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/06] | Title | German: | Tintenpatrone | [1997/06] | English: | Ink cartridge | [1997/06] | French: | Cartouche d'encre | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02006452.3 / EP1219445 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0663295 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,9-13,17 * page 4, lines 1-20 * * page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 2; figures 2,3A-3F * * figure 3F * [A] 16 [Y] 2,4,8-11,13,14; | [Y]US4628334 (DAGNA GIANDOMENICO [IT], et al) [Y] 2,4,8-11,13,14 * figure 2 *; | [XA]EP0585615 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 6,9-13 * page 3, columns 31-44 * * page 28, columns 37-45; figure 26; example 14 * * figure 1 * [A] 17; | [X]EP0639462 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 17-19 * column 10, lines 23-44; figures 1,5A,10 *; | [XA]GB2017006 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 17 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 74-81 * [A] 1,6; | [A]US4970533 (SAITO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,17 * abstract *; | [A]FR2440884 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,17 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9220577 (GRAPHIC UTILITIES INC [US]) [A] 1,6,17 * figures 1,2A * |