EP0757407 - Films and coatings having anisotropic conductive pathways therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOCTITE (IRELAND) LIMITED Tallaght Business Park, Whitestown, Tallaght Dublin 24 / IE | [1997/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McArdle, Ciaran Bernard 17 Foxrock Manor, Leopardstown Road Dublin 18 / IE | 02 /
Burke, Joseph 34 Delbrook Park, Ballinteer Road Dundrum, Dublin 14 / IE | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305657.7 | 31.07.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | IE19950000589 | 01.08.1995 Original published format: IE 950589 | [1997/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757407 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757407 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/04, H01F1/44 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
H05K3/323 (EP,US);
H01F41/16 (EP,US);
H01R4/04 (EP,US);
H05K2201/083 (EP,US);
H05K2203/104 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/06] | Extension states | AL | 29.08.1996 | LT | 29.08.1996 | LV | 29.08.1996 | SI | 29.08.1996 | Title | German: | Filme und Beschichtungen mit anisotropisch leitenden Bahnen darin | [1997/06] | English: | Films and coatings having anisotropic conductive pathways therein | [1997/06] | French: | Des films et revêtements incorporant des chemins conducteurs anisotropes | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.2001 | CH | 11.04.2001 | LI | 11.04.2001 | DK | 11.07.2001 | PT | 11.07.2001 | GR | 13.07.2001 | BE | 31.07.2001 | LU | 31.07.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.04.2001 | |
CH | 11.04.2001 | ||
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
BE | 31.07.2001 | ||
LU | 31.07.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 11.04.2001 | |
CH | 11.04.2001 | ||
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
BE | 31.07.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 11.04.2001 | |
CH | 11.04.2001 | ||
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
DK | 11.07.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
BE | 31.07.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | AT | 11.04.2001 | |
CH | 11.04.2001 | ||
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
BE | 31.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 11.04.2001 | |
CH | 11.04.2001 | ||
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
PT | 11.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 11.04.2001 | |
CH | 11.04.2001 | ||
LI | 11.04.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 11.04.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0402546 (KEY TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1,6,12,15 * claims 1,4,13,19 * [A] 2,4,7,9; | [A]WO9518476 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [DPX]WO9520820 (LOCTITE IRELAND LTD [IE], et al) [DPX] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y] - D.A.THOMPSON, "Liquid Magnetic Bubble Display", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (197411), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 1842 - 1843, XP002016043 [Y] 1,6,12,15 * page 1842, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 1843, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * | [A] - SUNGHO JIN ET AL, "ANISOTROPICALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYMER FILMS WITH A UNIFORM DISPERSION OF PARTICLES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS,HYBRIDS,AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, (19931201), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 972 - 977, XP000443371 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/33.273699 |