EP0761788 - Protective film for polarizing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Toru c/o Konica Corp., 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Morita, Naoko c/o Konica Corp., 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nagayasu, Koichi c/o Konica Corp., 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Michihata, Isamu c/o Konica Corp., 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Nara, Masaji c/o Konica Corp., 1, Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305806.0 | 07.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | JP19950205758 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: JP 20575895 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761788 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761788 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/08, C09J131/04, C09J135/00, G02B1/10 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G02B1/16 (EP,US);
G02B1/14 (US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/11] | Title | German: | Schutzfilm für polarisierende Platten | [1997/11] | English: | Protective film for polarizing plate | [1997/11] | French: | Film protecteur pour plaque polarisante | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.10.1999 | IT | 20.10.1999 | DE | 21.01.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 20.10.1999 | |
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | DE | 21.01.2000 | |
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | FR | 17.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57195208 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [X]JPS6136335 (TSB KK) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract *; | [X]JPH044219 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [X] 1-5,9,10 * abstract *; | [X]WO9212186 (ISP INVESTMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP0538866 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 4, line 38 - line 44 *; | [A]JPH06136148 (ACHILLES CORP) [A] 1,6-8 * abstract *; | [E]EP0727471 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1,6-10 * the whole document * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 08, Database accession no. 92-060108 [ ] * abstract * |