Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0758832
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.10.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
26.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
19.10.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
13.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.06.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.12.1999 |
First examination report |
|
23.12.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.12.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] |
03.01.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] |
03.01.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] |
06.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
06.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - payment of search fee |
|