Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3319678B | Global Dossier | 03.09.2002 | B2 | JPH0955916 | 25.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22602095 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0758832 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2001 | B1 | EP0758832 | 11.02.1998 | A3 | EP0758832 | 19.02.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP22602095 | 11.08.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5754728 | 19.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP22602095 | 11.08.1995 |