EP0786785 - Manganese-aluminum magnet with far-infrared radiation properties and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iso, Yutaro Belle Court 401, 25-6, Senzoku 4-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Creation Renai Co., Ltd. Towa Sky Bldg. 501, 13-21, Taito 4-chome Taioto-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO., LTD. No. 3007, Nakashima Aza Ichimonji Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken 672 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states Iso, Yutaro Belle Court 401, 25-6, Senzoku 4-chome Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Creation Renai Co., Ltd. Towa Sky Bldg. 501, 13-21, Taito 4-chome Taioto-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
For all designated states SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO., LTD. No. 3007, Nakashima Aza Ichimonji Shikama-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Naoto, c/o Sanyo Special Steel Co., Ltd of 3007 Nakashima Aza Ichimonji, Shikama-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohkawa, Atsushi, c/o Sanyo Special Steel Co.Ltd of 3007 Nakashima Aza Ichimonji, Shikama-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Umana, Noriyuki, c/o Sanyo Special Steel Co.Ltd of 3007 Nakashima Aza Ichimonji, Shikama-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Iso, Yutaro Belle Court 401, 25-6, Senzoku 4-chome Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1997/31] | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96305911.8 | 12.08.1996 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | JP19950227445 | 10.08.1995 Original published format: JP 22744595 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786785 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/02, H01F1/047 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
A61N5/06 (EP,US);
A61N2/06 (EP,US);
H01F1/047 (EP,US);
H01F41/0253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/31] | Title | German: | Mangan-Aluminium Magnet mit Ferninfrarotstrahlungseigenschaften und Herstellungsverfahren dessselben | [1997/31] | English: | Manganese-aluminum magnet with far-infrared radiation properties and method of manufacturing the same | [1997/31] | French: | Aimant de manganèse-aluminium à propriétés de radiation dans l'infra-rouge lointain et son procédé de fabrication | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/13] | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/14] | 05.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH05347206 ; | [YA]JPH06295806 ; | [A]JPS63311968 ; | [A]JPS6059720 ; | [A]JPH02145653 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940331), vol. 018, no. 188, Database accession no. (E - 1532), & JP05347206 A 19931227 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [YD] 1,2 * abstract * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 94, no. 010, & JP06295806 A 19941021 (SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 6,7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890414), vol. 013, no. 156, Database accession no. (C - 585), & JP63311968 A 19881220 (TOYO IRYO KENKYUSHO:KK) [A] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850809), vol. 009, no. 193, Database accession no. (E - 334), & JP60059720 A 19850406 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900823), vol. 014, no. 390, Database accession no. (C - 0751), & JP02145653 A 19900605 (SANKYO KASEI KK) [A] * abstract * |