EP0759589 - Portable computer accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barrus, Jeffrey C. 16410 Willowbank Road Tomball, Texas 77375 / US | 02 /
Perkins, Dean P. 12138 Auburn Hills Drive Tomball, Texas 77375 / US | 03 /
Leman, Michael V. 8919 Stoney Bend Drive Spring, Texas 77379 / US | 04 /
Moore, Paul M. 9114 Elk Bend Drive Spring, Texas 77379 / US | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306042.1 | 19.08.1996 | [1997/09] | Priority number, date | US19950517382 | 21.08.1995 Original published format: US 517382 | [1997/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0759589 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0759589 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | [1997/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759589 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/09] | Title | German: | Zubehör für tragbaren Rechner | [1997/09] | English: | Portable computer accessory | [1997/09] | French: | Accessoire pour ordinateur portable | [1997/09] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5293300 (LEUNG CHEE-CHUN [TW]) [X] 1-5,8,14-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4426262 (TOSHIBA KAWASAKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,14 * column 11, paragraph 3; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0666523 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,14,16 * abstract *; | [A]US5107401 (YOUN JAESAM [KR]) [A] 1,8,14,19 * abstract * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Handle Used As Battery Compartment", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (198504), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 6692 - 6693, XP002017931 [A] 1-5,14 * the whole document * |