EP0826608 - Spray mechanism for an aerosol product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Industrial Co., Ltd. 4-60, Tagawakita 3-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | [1998/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Kiwamu, c/o Kyowa Ind. Co., Ltd. 4-60, Tagawakita 3-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Lyndon-Stanford, Edward W.B. Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Lyndon-Stanford, Edward Willoughby Brooke MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306225.2 | 28.08.1996 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0826608 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0826608 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/52 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
B65D83/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1998/10] | Title | German: | Sprühmechanismus für Aerosolprodukte | [1998/10] | English: | Spray mechanism for an aerosol product | [1998/10] | French: | Mécanisme de pulvérisation pour un produit aérosol | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/23] | 04.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.04.2002 | NL | 03.04.2002 | DK | 03.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
DK | 03.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 03.04.2002 | |
NL | 03.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 03.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3913804 (LAAUWE ROBERT H) [A] 1,5,6 * column 4, line 33 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0332389 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [A] 1,5,6* column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0538543 (PRAEZISIONS VENTIL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [X]FR2711973 (KYOWA IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 7, line 13 - page 17, line 23; figures 1-6 * |