EP0763767 - Compact and fabrication tolerant high speed digital optical Y-switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2002 [2002/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1997/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khan, Mujibun Nisa, c/o Lucent Technologies Inc. Room R-113, 791 Holmdel- Keyport Road Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | 02 /
Zucker, Jane Elisa 35 Chilton Lane Aberdeen, New Jersey 07747 / US | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306379.7 | 03.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | US19950528823 | 15.09.1995 Original published format: US 528823 | [1997/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763767 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/313, G02B6/12 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
G02F1/3138 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1997/12] | Title | German: | Kompakter, digitaler optischer Hochgeschwindigkeits-Y-Schalter mit hoher Fertigungstoleranz | [1997/12] | English: | Compact and fabrication tolerant high speed digital optical Y-switches | [1997/12] | French: | Commutateur digital optique en Y, compact, à grande vitesse et tolerant aux écarts de fabrication | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/39] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6155612 ; | [A]JPS6363007 ; | [DXA] - KHAN M N ET AL, "Design and demonstration of weighted-coupling digital Y-branch optical switches in InGaAs/InGaAlAs electron transfer waveguides", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (19941101), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 2032 - 2039, XP000485322 [DX] 1,3,4,8-12 * sections I - III *;; figures 1,2,7-9 * [A] 2,5-7,13-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.336069 | [DX] - KHAN M N ET AL, "Weighted-coupling Y-branch optical switch in InGaAs/InGaAlAs quantum well electron transfer waveguides", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19940301), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 394 - 397, XP000439718 [DX] 1,3,4,8-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.275498 | [A] - VEERMAN F B ET AL, "An optical passive 3-dB TMI-coupler with reduced fabrication tolerance sensitivity", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (19920301), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 306 - 311, XP000272888 [A] 2,12,13,15 * page 306, column R - page 307, column R; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.124491 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860731), vol. 010, no. 220, Database accession no. (P - 482), & JP61055612 A 19860320 (SHOJIRO KAWAKAMI;OTHERS: 01) [A] 2,13,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880804), vol. 012, no. 284, Database accession no. (P - 740), & JP63063007 A 19880319 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 2,13,15 * abstract * | [A] - ROLLAND C ET AL, "Optimization of strongly guiding semiconductor rib waveguide Y-junctions", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19900601), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 404 - 406, XP000147998 [A] 2,15 * section I *; page 405, column L, line 35 - page 406, column L; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.56600 | [A] - WEISSMANN Z ET AL, "Very low-loss Y-junction power divider", OPTICS LETTERS, (19890301), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 293 - 295, XP000098986 [A] 2,15 * page 293, column R, paragraph 3 - page 294, column L, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | [A] - NELSON W H ET AL, "Wavelength- and polarization-independent large angle InP/InGaAsP digital optical switches with extinction ratios exceeding 20dB", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19941101), vol. 6, no. 11, pages 1332 - 1334, XP000486192 [A] 1,2,13,14 * sections I - III *;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.334830 |