EP0789284 - Image forming apparatus and a charging member therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirabayashi, Jun c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ito, Nobuyuki c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishiyama, Harumi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Furuya, Tadashi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Chigono, Yasunori c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Mashimo, Seiji c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306519.8 | 09.09.1996 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | JP19950231830 | 08.09.1995 Original published format: JP 23183095 | JP19960228523 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22852396 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789284 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789284 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/02 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
G03G15/0241 (EP,US);
G03G2215/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/33] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät und Aufladeelement hierfür | [1997/33] | English: | Image forming apparatus and a charging member therefor | [1997/33] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images et élément de chargement associé | [1997/33] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0576203 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [D]JPH063921 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0596477 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0622703 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1,4-9 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0709746 (CANON KK [JP]) [PA] 1,4-9 * the whole document * |