EP0764912 - Electronic price label replacement system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmerman, Terry Lee 1605 Prestonwood Court Lawrenceville, Georgia 30243 / US | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Brian NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2000/18] | Williamson, Brian Internatinal IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1997/28] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1997/13] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96306653.5 | 13.09.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | US19950531810 | 21.09.1995 Original published format: US 531810 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0764912 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0764912 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/13] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Ersetzen von elektronischen Preisschildern | [1997/13] | English: | Electronic price label replacement system and method | [1997/13] | French: | Système et méthode de remplacement d'étiquettes électroniques de prix | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5448226 (FAILING JR BRUCE F [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - line 57 * * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 5 * * claims 20-25 *; | [Y]US4754217 (GERMER WARREN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 40 * * column 3, line 31 - line 40 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9216901 (ESEL KRABBE SYSTEMS AS [DK]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 13 * * page 12, line 5 - page 14, line 33 *; | [A]US5428547 (IKEDA MUTSUMI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 6, line 20 * * column 14, line 44 - column 15, line 65 *; | [A]US5301106 (HERSUM MARK T [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - column 3, line 7 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 23 * |