EP0765958 - Weft feeding device for a fluid-jet weaving machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICRON INSTRUMENT INC. 2-9-18 Chidori Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states Micron Instrument Inc. 2-9-18 Chidori Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Iwao, c/o Micron Instruments Inc. 2-9-18 Chidori, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Kidokoro, Toshiyuki, c/o Micron Instruments Inc. 2-9-18 Chidori, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Piésold, Alexander J. Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307122.0 | 27.09.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | JP19950254102 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25410295 | JP19960183760 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18376096 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0765958 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/36 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
D03D47/361 (EP,KR,US);
D03D47/36 (EP,KR,US);
D03D47/125 (EP,KR,US);
D03J1/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, IT [1997/14] | Title | German: | Schussfadenliefervorrichtung für Düsenwebmaschine | [1997/14] | English: | Weft feeding device for a fluid-jet weaving machine | [1997/14] | French: | Tournisseur de trame pour métier à jet de fluide | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 30.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/42] | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4116321 (MILLER ALAN LEONARD) [A] 7* column A *; | [X]GB2039302 (SAURER AG ADOLPH) [X] 1,2,9 * page 1, line 114 - page 2, line 71; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]CH664344 (SCHWEIZERISCHE VISCOSE) [X] 1,2,9 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [YA]EP0477877 (TSUDAKOMA IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 16; figure 1 * [A] 4-8 |