EP0769844 - Current control circuit for a reluctance machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LIMITED East Park House, Otley Road Harrogate, North Yorkshire HG3 1PR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Michael James 8 Granby Mount Headingley, Leeds, LS6 3AY / GB | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307202.0 | 02.10.1996 | [1997/17] | Priority number, date | GB19950021332 | 18.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9521332 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0769844 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0769844 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/05, H02M3/156 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
H02P29/026 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (EP,US);
H02P25/08 (EP,US);
H02P25/0925 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/17] | Title | German: | Stromregelungskreis für Reluktanzmaschine | [1997/17] | English: | Current control circuit for a reluctance machine | [1997/17] | French: | Circuit de commande du courant pour machine à réluctance variable | [1997/17] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 13.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.05.2000 | NL | 31.05.2000 | SE | 31.08.2000 | [2003/09] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 31.05.2000 | |
SE | 31.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | SE | 31.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0635931 (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 4; figure 4 *; | [A]JPH0522941 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930611), vol. 017, no. 307, Database accession no. (E - 1379), & JP05022941 A 19930129 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1,2,10,13 * abstract * |