EP0768104 - Game board having mechanical characters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salley, Sybil P.O. Box 452 Pinehurst Texas 77362 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states Salley, Sybil P.O. Box 452 Pinehurst, Texas 77362 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/16] | Wise, Stephen James, et al c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307399.4 | 10.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | US19950541831 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: US 541831 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0768104 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0768104 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63F3/02, A63F3/00 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
A63F3/00028 (EP,US);
A63F3/00643 (EP,US);
A63F2011/0016 (EP,US);
A63F3/00082 (EP,US);
A63F3/00634 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/16] | A63F3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/16] | Title | German: | Spielbrett mit mechanischem Charakter | [1997/16] | English: | Game board having mechanical characters | [1997/16] | French: | Plateau de jeu à caractère mécanique | [1997/16] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/43] | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4324405 (KRUGER JR FREDERICK W, et al) [Y] 5-10 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5205554 (COPSON ALEXANDER G [US]) [Y] 5-10 * column 1, lines 58-64 * * column 2, lines 31-34 *; | [A]FR893820 (PARMAINTENY) [A] 5-10 * page 2, column R *; | [A]US4323243 (HANSON STEVEN P, et al) [A] 5-7 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4300770 (KNETZGER ROBERT C) [A] 5 * claim 1 * |