EP0769818 - Solar cell module having a surface side covering material with a specific nonwoven glass fiber member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/17] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Ichiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mori, Takahiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Satoru Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shiotsuka, Hidenori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Komori, Ayako Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/17] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/17] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307508.0 | 16.10.1996 | [1997/17] | Priority number, date | JP19950293315 | 17.10.1995 Original published format: JP 29331595 | JP19960018283 | 10.01.1996 Original published format: JP 1828396 | [1997/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0769818 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0769818 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | [1999/31] |
Former [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP0769818 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[1998/53] | |||
[1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/048, H01L31/0392, H01L31/05 | [1997/17] | CPC: |
H01L31/048 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/042 (KR);
B32B17/04 (EP,US);
B32B17/067 (EP,US);
B32B17/10788 (EP,US);
H01L31/0481 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1997/17] | Title | German: | Solarzellenmodul mit einem Beschichtungsmaterial für eine Oberfläche, mit einem Teil aus spezifischem Glasfaservliesstoff | [1997/17] | English: | Solar cell module having a surface side covering material with a specific nonwoven glass fiber member | [1997/17] | French: | Module de cellules solaires comportant un matériau de revêtement de surface avec une partie spécifique en fibres de verre non-tissé | [1997/17] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/53] | Divisional application(s) | EP04076657.8 / EP1458035 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]EP0681335 (CANON KK [JP]) [PY] 1-3,5,9-11,16-18,20-23 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 38 * * page 6, lines 44-49 * * page 7, lines 3-27 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 26 * * page 11, lines 40-57; figures 1,4,6 *; | [Y]WO9509442 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,9-11,16-18,20-23; | [Y]EP0071181 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5,9-11,16-18,20-23 * page 4 - page 5; figure 1; claims 1-4,7,8,10,11,19,22 *; | [A]JPS551115 ; | [A]EP0641030 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,11,16-22,24 * page 3, lines 11-27; figure 1 * * page 8, lines 45-57 * * page 14, lines 13-22 * * page 16, line 47 - page 17, line 40 * * page 24, lines 6-7; figures 1,2,7-9; claims 1,2,16,17 *; | [A]EP0500066 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,11,21 * page 6, lines 23-28; figure 9; claims 9,11 *; | [A]EP0658943 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,9,11,16,17,20,22 * page 5, lines 23-54; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 7, line 50 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, lines 52-54 *; | [A]JPS5538807 ; | [A]JPS6419780 ; | [A]US4692557 (SAMUELSON GAY M [US], et al); | [PX]EP0680098 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1-3,9,11,16,17,20-23 * page 9, line 25 - page 11, line 9; figures 1,2,6 * * page 8, lines 20-33 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800308), vol. 004, no. 028, Database accession no. (E - 001), & JP55001115 A 19800107 (AGENCY OF IND SCIENCE & TECHNOL) [A] 1,3,21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800528), vol. 4, no. 73, Database accession no. (C - 012), & JP55038807 A 19800318 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) [A] 1,21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890511), vol. 013, no. 198, Database accession no. (E - 756), & JP01019780 A 19890123 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 2,22 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6233756 |