EP0770411 - Implantable cardiac stimulation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court, P.O. Box 9221 Sylmar California 91392-9221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states Pacesetter, Inc. 15900 Valley View Court, P.O. Box 9221 Sylmar, California 91392-9221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Causey, James D., III 2107 Cushman Court Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307548.6 | 17.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19950544524 | 18.10.1995 Original published format: US 544524 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770411 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770411 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770411 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
A61N1/3931 (EP,US);
A61N1/3925 (EP,US);
A61N1/3987 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/18] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Vorrichtung zur Herzstimulation | [1997/18] | English: | Implantable cardiac stimulation device | [1997/18] | French: | Dispositif de stimulation cardiaque implantable | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/13] | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.12.2004 | NL | 22.12.2004 | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5191884 (GILLI NORMA L [US], et al) [A] 1,4-8 * column 2, lines 18-55 * * column 8, lines 23-36 * * column 9, lines 15-22 *; | [A]EP0599588 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-8 * column 1, lines 1-23 * * column 3, lines 11-31 * * column 4, lines 10-28 * * column 6, lines 3-19 * * column 8, line 51 - column 10, line 22 *; | [A]US4448197 (NAPPHOLZ TIBOR A [AU], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7 * column 1, lines 5-36 * * column 2, lines 60-63 *; | [A]US5425749 (ADAMS THEODORE P [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 4 *; | [A]US5411537 (MUNSHI MOHAMMED Z [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7-9 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 5 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 8 * * column 11, line 51 - column 12, line 12 * | by applicant | US4830006 | - INFLUENCE OF VENTRICULAR FIBRILLATION DURATION ON DEFIBRILLATION ENERGY IN DOGS USING BIDIRECTIONAL PULSE DISCHARGES, 11 PACE NO. 9, (198809), page 1315 | US19930091636 |