EP0772334 - Radiotelephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seppanen, Jorma A. Syrjakatu 305c 90100 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Vaihoja, Juha Sortavalantie 20 91910 Tupos / FI | 03 /
Lietsalmi, Mikko Suunistajantie 2B 90650 Oulu / FI | 04 /
Vanttila, Jaakko 557 Santa Helena Solana Beach, CA 92075 / FI | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [1997/19] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al NOKIA MOBILE PHONES, Patent Department, St. Georges Court, St. Georges Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307645.0 | 22.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | US19950554277 | 06.11.1995 Original published format: US 554277 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0772334 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0772334 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772334 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
H04M19/041 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M19/04 (EP,US);
H04M19/042 (EP,US);
H04M19/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Funkgerät | [1997/19] | English: | Radiotelephone | [1997/19] | French: | Radiotéléphone | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04105711.8 / EP1513331 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2135841 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-3,5-12,14,15 * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 103; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4523058 (STEVENS JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4982424 (SAITO AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0611070 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 25 - column 7, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US5404582 (DEMURO DAVID M [US], et al) [Y] 1,7-9,11,12,14,15 * column 3, line 50 - column 11, line 41; figures 1-7 * [A] 2,3; | [PX]GB2298549 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-5,7-9,12,13 * page 15, line 36 - page 23, line 34; figures 1,2 ** page 30, line 6 - page 40, line 4; figures 7-10 *; | [XY] - SPRING ET AL, "TELEPHONE RING MUTE WITH AUTO RE-ENABLE", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (19930601), vol. 19, page 117, XP000361504 [X] 2-5 * the whole document * [Y] 1,7-9,11,12,14,15 |