EP0770985 - Signal encoding method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Jun c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Omori, Shiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nishiguchi, Masayuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Iijima, Kazuyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307742.5 | 25.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | JP19950302199 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: JP 30219995 | JP19950302130 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: JP 30213095 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0770985 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0770985 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770985 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, G10L19/04 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
G10L19/0212 (EP,US);
G10L19/04 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/0208 (EP,US);
G10L19/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/18] | G10L3/02, G10L7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sprachkodierung | [1997/18] | English: | Signal encoding method and apparatus | [1997/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de codage de la parole | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02017464.5 / EP1262956 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0396121 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [X] 1,8,12 * abstract * * claims 6,7,17 *; | [A] - LAURENT P A ET AL, "A ROBUST 2400 BPS SUBBAND LPC VOCODER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), DETROIT, MAY 9 - 12, 1995 SPEECH, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950509), VOL. 1, pages 500 - 503, XP000658040 [A] 1,8,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1995.479638 |