EP0770661 - Lubricant for drilling mud [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B W MUD LIMITED Abbotswell Road, West Tullos Aberdeen AB1 4AD / GB | [1997/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapman, John, c/o B W Mud Limited Abbotswell Road West Tullos, Aberdeen, AB1 4AD / GB | 02 /
Ward, Ian, c/o B W Mud Limited Abbotswell Road West Tullos, Aberdeen, AB1 4AD / GB | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Pattullo, Norman, et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307766.4 | 28.10.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | GB19950022076 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9522076 | GB19950022063 | 27.10.1995 Original published format: GB 9522063 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770661 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C09K7/02, C01B33/22, C10M169/04 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
C09K8/22 (EP);
C09K8/145 (EP);
C09K8/16 (EP);
C10M105/34 (EP);
C09K2208/34 (EP);
C10M2207/281 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, NL [1997/18] | Title | German: | Schmierstoff für Bohrschlamm | [1997/18] | English: | Lubricant for drilling mud | [1997/18] | French: | Lubrifiant pour boue de forage | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/49] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3761410 (MONDSHINE T, et al) [Y] 1,4-7,10,17-20 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 54 * * column 6, line 50 - line 63 *; | [Y]US4517100 (NANCE WELDON B [US], et al) [Y] 1,10,17-20 * column 2, line 15 - line 47 * * column 3, line 1 - line 49 *; | [Y]GB2077327 (HALLIBURTON CO) [Y] 1,4-7 * page 1, line 25 - line 61 * * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 57 *; | [YA]US2349585 (BOND DONALD C, et al) [Y] 1,4-7 * page 1, column R, line 44 - page 2, column L, line 36 * * page 2, column R, line 72 - page 3, column L, line 9; claims 1-8 * [A] 11; | [YP]EP0713909 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [YP] 1,4-7,17-20 * page 2, line 27 - line 46 * * page 3, line 20 - line 24 *; | [Y]GB2283036 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,4-7,17-20 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 12 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 29 * * page 7, line 19 - line 31 *; | [Y]GB2099412 (HALLIBURTON CO) [Y] 12-16 * page 2, line 14 - line 54 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 5 * * claims 1-4,10-13 *; | [YP]WO9622245 (BRUNNER MOND & CO LTD [GB], et al) [YP] 12-16 * page 1, line 1 - line 25 * * page 3, line 4 - line 21 * |