Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09186016 | Global Dossier | 15.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US55407195 | 06.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0772210 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | B1 | EP0772210 | 07.05.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55407195 | 06.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69618147T | 18.07.2002 | T2 | DE69618147D1 | 31.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US55407195 | 06.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5665465 | 09.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US55407195 | 06.11.1995 |