EP0772210 - Article comprising exchange-coupled magnetic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gyorgy, Ernst Michael Deceased / US | 02 /
Suzuki, Yuri 548B Springfield Avenue, Apt. 3C Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US | 03 /
Phillips, Julia Mae 2416 Venetian Way S.W. Albuquerque, New Mexico 87015 / US | 04 /
van Dover, Robert Bruce 58 Jefferson Avenue Maplewood, New Jersey 07040 / US | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307790.4 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | US19950554071 | 06.11.1995 Original published format: US 554071 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772210 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772210 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01F10/08, H01F17/00 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
H01F17/0006 (EP,US);
H01F10/3218 (EP,US);
H01F2017/0046 (EP,US);
H01F2017/0066 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/19] | Title | German: | Gegenstand enthaltend austauschgekoppelte magnetische Materialien | [2000/50] | English: | Article comprising exchange-coupled magnetic materials | [1997/19] | French: | Dispositif comprenant des matériaux à accouplement d'interchange | [1997/19] |
Former [1997/19] | Element mit Wechselkupplung-Materialien | Examination procedure | 23.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/52] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6468914 ; | [A]US4001793 (HENRY RODNEY D, et al) [A] 1-3,12 * column 2, line 40 - line 60 * * column 5, line 56 - line 61; figures 3,4; claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]US4624901 (GLASS HOWARD L [US]) [A] 1,2,10-12 * column 1, line 52 - line 56 * * column 6, line 33 - line 40 * * column 8, line 3 - line 9; claims 1,9-11 *; | [X] - BORCHERS J A ET AL, "PROPAGATION OF ANTIFERROMAGNETIC ORDER ACROSS PARAMAGNETIC LAYERS IN COO/NIO SUPERLATTICES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19930515), vol. 73, no. 10 PT. 02B, pages 6898 - 6900, XP000380627 [X] 1,10,12 * page 6898 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.352427 | [X] - USTINOV V V ET AL, "FERROMAGNETIC RESONANCE IN EPITAXIAL IRON-GARNET MAGNETICALLY COUPLED LAYERS", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (19920701), vol. 113, no. 1 / 03, pages 1 - 7, XP000324519 [X] 1-3,10,12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 7, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-8853(92)91239-P | [A] - M.CAREY ET AL, "COO-NIO SUPERLATTICES: INTERLAYER INTERACTIONS AND EXCHANGE ANISOTROPY WITH NI81FE19", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19930515), vol. 73, no. 10 PT. 02B, pages 6892 - 6897, XP000380626 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.352426 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890629), vol. 013, no. 285, Database accession no. (E - 780), & JP01068914 A 19890315 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | - YELON A., Physics of Thin Films., NEW YORK., ACADEMIC PRESS., (1971), vol. 6, pages 205 - 300 | - TSANG C., IEEE TRANS. MAG., (1989), vol. 25, page 3692 | - ARAI K.I. ET AL., IEEE TRANS. MAG., (1991), vol. 27, page 5337 | - CULLITY B.D., Introduction to Magnetic Materials., ADDISON-WESLEY., (1972), pages 422 - 425 |