EP0773633 - Housing for portable radio [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koleda, Eugeniusz Z. Kiselvej 7F 2730 Herlev / DK | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Higgin, Paul, et al Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | Jones, Kendra Louise, et al Nokia IPR Department, Nokia House, Summit Avenue Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0NG / GB | ||
Former [1997/20] | Slingsby, Philip Roy, et al NOKIA MOBILE PHONES, Patent Department, St. Georges Court, St. Georges Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307940.5 | 01.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | GB19950022866 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9522866 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773633 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773633 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H01Q1/24 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
H04B1/3833 (EP,US);
H01Q1/088 (EP,US);
H01Q1/244 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/20] | H04B1/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Gehäuse für tragbares Funkgerät | [1997/20] | English: | Housing for portable radio | [1997/20] | French: | Boîtier de radio portable | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 29.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/47] | 14.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5343213 (KOTTKE WILFRIED E [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 57 - column 6, line 4; figures 3-9 *; | [A]EP0634806 (YOKOWO SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 12, line 2 - page 14, line 45; figures 12-19 * |