EP0771616 - Heavy duty coil spring compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facom UK Limited Churchbridge Works, Walsall Road Cannock Staffordshire WS11 3JR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Facom UK Limited Churchbridge Works, Walsall Road Cannock, Staffordshire WS11 3JR / GB | ||
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states SYKES-PICKAVANT LIMITED Kilnhouse Lane Lytham St. Annes, Lancashire FY8 3DU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cross, John Milton House, Mill Lane, Goosnargh Preston PR3 2JX, Lancashire / GB | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Attfield, Donald James, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [2001/37] |
Former [1997/19] | Attfield, Donald James Barker, Brettell & Duncan 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 96307950.4 | 01.11.1996 | [1997/19] | Priority number, date | GB19950022557 | 03.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9522557 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0771616 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0771616 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B25B27/30 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
B25B27/304 (EP);
B60G2206/921 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Hochbelastbarer Spiralfederkompressor | [1997/19] | English: | Heavy duty coil spring compressor | [1997/19] | French: | Compresseur de ressorts hélicoidaux de grand puissance | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB2017561 (KLANN H) [DA] 1-7 * figure -; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0629474 (WEITNER WERNER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *; | [DA]GB2261185 (SYKES PICKAVANT LTD [GB]) [DA] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [A]EP0424247 (MECANIQUE ENERGETIQUE [FR]) [A] 3 * column A; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0250638 (KLANN HORST) | by applicant | GB2017561 | GB2261185 |